OR HB2876 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Department of Administrative Services to study alternative methods to implement retainage provisions in public improvement contracts. Requires Oregon Department of Administrative Services to study alternative methods to implement retainage provisions in public improvement contracts. Directs department to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to public procurement not later than September 15, 2024.
Title
Relating to retainage in public improvement contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-24 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Business and Labor (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to Business and Labor by order of Speaker. |
2023-01-25 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Business and Labor. |
2023-01-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |