OR HB2876 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Chapter 373, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Chapter 373, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits health care facility from allowing person without certain qualifications to practice surgical technology. Provides exception for health care facility in rural or medically underserved area of state] community. Directs Oregon Health Authority to adopt rules necessary to carry out provisions relating to practice of surgical technology. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the practice of surgical technology; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | House | Chapter 373, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2015. |
2015-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Beyer, Olsen. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-04-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Buehler. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 3--Heard, Nearman, Post; Excused, 1--Smith. |
2015-04-23 | House | Second reading. |
2015-04-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2015-02-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |