OR HB2857 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces amount payable by municipal or justice court for deposit in Criminal Fine Account from $60 to $45.
Title
Relating to offenses; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |