OR HB2843 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-13)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-13)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires counties to develop community mental health action plans to identify and address mental health concerns. Not later than January 1, 2021, requires counties to submit community mental health action plans to Oregon Health Authority. Directs authority to submit report to Legislative Assembly. Not later than January 1, 2023, requires counties to submit reports to authority detailing whether county addressed mental health concerns. Directs authority to submit report to Legislative Assembly. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to mental health; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-31 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2843 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2843/Introduced |