OR HB2823 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 6 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-08 - In conference committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 6 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-08 - In conference committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies individuals who may control association accounts of planned community or condominium.
Title
Relating to communities governed by declaration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In conference committee upon adjournment. |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Senators George, Prozanski, Shields appointed Senate conferees. |
2013-06-21 | House | Representatives Holvey, Chair; Lively, Thatcher appointed House conferees. |
2013-06-11 | House | House refused to concur in Senate amendments. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Knopp, granted unanimous consent to change vote to nay. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by George. Passed. Ayes, 25; nays, 4--Knopp, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Baertschiger. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-04-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed. Ayes, 59; Nays, 1--Barton. |
2013-04-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 23, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-18 | House | Second reading. |
2013-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-04-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-15 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency. |
2013-02-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |