OR HB2819 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits vehicle dealer to issue temporary registration permits for motor vehicles that do not have proof of compliance with pollution control equipment requirements. Permits vehicle dealer to issue temporary registration permits for motor vehicles that do not have proof of compliance with pollution control equipment requirements. Requires dealer to give written notice to purchaser that Department of Transportation will not issue stickers, registration or plates unless proof of compliance is provided. Modifies trip permit issuance by Department of Transportation.
Title
Relating to motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Climate, Energy, and Environment. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |