OR HB2816 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires person who owns, operates or controls high energy use facility to ensure that greenhouse gas emissions associated with electricity used by high energy use facility are reduced to 60 percent below baseline emissions levels by 2027, 80 percent below baseline emissions levels by 2030, 90 percent below baseline emissions levels by 2035 and 100 percent below baseline emissions levels by 2040. Requires person who owns, operates or controls high energy use facility to ensure that greenhouse gas emissions associated with electricity used by high energy use facility are reduced to 60 percent below baseline emissions levels by 2027, 80 percent below baseline emissions levels by 2030, 90 percent below baseline emissions levels by 2035 and 100 percent below baseline emissions levels by 2040. Requires person to provide annual report to Department of Environmental Quality to demonstrate compliance. Imposes civil penalty of $12,000 per megawatt-hour in violation for each day of violation. Excludes property that is or is part of high energy use facility from enterprise zone tax benefits unless amount of greenhouse gas emissions associated with electricity that high energy use facility uses complies with amount of greenhouse gas emissions associated with electricity permitted for high energy use facilities.
Title
Relating to high energy use facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Rep. Khanh Pham [D] | Rep. Farrah Chaichi [D] |
Rep. Mark Gamba [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Climate, Energy, and Environment. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |