OR HB2815 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides funding for instruction of talented and gifted children based on amount per student. Requires school districts to provide instruction for talented and gifted children. First applies to 2015-2016 school year. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.
Title
Relating to funding for talented and gifted children; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Parrish [R] | Rep. Gene Whisnant [R] | Rep. Knute Buehler [R] | Rep. Jodi Hack [R] |
Sen. Kathleen Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2015-02-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB2815 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2815/Introduced |