OR HB2809 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 235, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 235, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows temporary siting for up to 24 months of recreational vehicles on properties with dwellings that natural disasters have made uninhabitable. Allows temporary siting for up to 24 months of recreational vehicles on properties with dwellings that natural disasters have made uninhabitable.
Title
Relating to temporary siting of recreational vehicles on properties with dwellings destroyed by natural disasters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 235, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Kennemer. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 8--Boquist, Findley, Frederick, Hansell, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith DB. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Clem, Levy, Smith Warner. |
2021-04-14 | House | Carried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Carried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Wildfire Recovery. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |