OR HB2797 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Chapter 211, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Chapter 211, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires subject employer to pay first installment of temporary disability compensation in workers' compensation claim within 14 days after employer has notice or knowledge of claim and has notice or knowledge of employee's disability. Requires subject employer to pay first installment of temporary disability compensation in workers' compensation claim within 14 days after employer has notice or knowledge of claim or] and has notice or knowledge of employee's disability , whichever is later].
Title
Relating to payment of temporary disability compensation in workers' compensation claim.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | House | Chapter 211, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016. |
2015-06-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Burdick. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Carried over to 05-20 by unanimous consent. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-04-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Clem, Gorsek, McLane. |
2015-04-16 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 17, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-04-15 | House | Second reading. |
2015-04-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-04-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2015-02-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |