OR HB2796 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands all-terrain vehicle highway access routes to include county roads. Expands all-terrain vehicle highway access routes to include county roads.
Title
Relating to all-terrain vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. James Hieb [R] | Rep. Bobby Levy [R] | Rep. Lily Morgan [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
Sen. Kim Thatcher [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |