OR HB2771 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Governor to certify to United States Secretary of Commerce that terms of national marine sanctuary located within seaward boundary of Oregon are unacceptable unless Legislative Assembly confirms designation. Requires Governor to certify to United States Secretary of Commerce that terms of national marine sanctuary located within seaward boundary of Oregon are unacceptable unless Legislative Assembly confirms designation.
Title
Relating to legislative confirmation of national marine sanctuaries.
Sponsors
Sen. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2021-02-04 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2021-02-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |