OR HB2759 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies definition of "marriage." Expands types of prohibited marriages. Clarifies that clergyperson, religious congregation or organization authorized to solemnize marriages may refuse to solemnize marriage that is contrary to tenets of religious congregation or organization. Provides that refusal to solemnize marriages does not affect tax exempt status of religious congregation or organization. Provides that two individuals who have lawfully established civil union, domestic partnership or similar relationship under laws of another state shall be considered as having entered into marriage under laws of this state, with privileges, immunities, rights, benefits and responsibilities of married persons, for period not longer than 12 months after entering state or establishing domicile in this state, unless parties enter into marriage before expiration of 12-month period. Authorizes same-sex, nonresident individuals who have lawfully established civil union, domestic partnership or similar relationship under laws of another state to make emergency medical decisions and funeral arrangements when in this state on temporary basis. Modifies residence requirements to establish jurisdiction of court to enter judgment of separation, annulment or dissolution of marriage. Provides that registered domestic partnerships that are not dissolved or annulled on or before December 31, 2016, shall become marriages for all legal purposes. Prohibits entering into or registering domestic partnerships after effective date of Act. Repeals Oregon Family Fairness Act. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to marital-type relationships between individuals; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB2759 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2759/Introduced |