OR HB2754 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to Department of Human Services to fund existing contracted domestic violence specialist positions in child welfare offices. Appropriates moneys to Department of Human Services to fund existing contracted domestic violence specialist positions in child welfare offices. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to contracted domestic violence specialists; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Noble [R] | Rep. Gary Leif [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Human Services with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2754 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2754/Introduced |