OR HB2728 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-20 - Chapter 682, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 15, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-20 - Chapter 682, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 15, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Oregon Talent Council. Specifies responsibilities of council. Requires council to develop Talent Development Plan and update plan each biennium. Establishes Oregon Talent Council Fund in State Treasury. Appropriates moneys to Employment Department for allocation to council for purposes of Act. Abolishes Engineering and Technology Industry Council and associated fund and account. Transfers moneys in fund and account to Oregon Talent Council Fund. Includes private sector member of Oregon Talent Council as member of Oregon Innovation Council. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Talent Council; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Johnson [R] | Rep. Tobias Read [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Rep. John Davis [R] |
Rep. John Huffman [R] | Rep. Gene Whisnant [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-03 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-20 | House | Chapter 682, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 15, 2015. |
2015-07-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-03 | House | Rules suspended. House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 3--Boquist, Ferrioli, Thomsen; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng. bill to resolve conflicts. (Printed C-Eng.) |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Weidner. |
2015-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2015-06-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-18 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-18 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-05-27 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-03-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-03-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-23 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Higher Education, Innovation, and Workforce Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |