OR HB2723 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes city to designate any urbanized area of city as urban agriculture incentive zone. Authorizes county or] city to designate any urbanized area of county or] city as urban agriculture incentive zone. Authorizes county to designate any urbanized area of county not within corporate boundaries of any city as urban agriculture incentive zone. Authorizes county or city to enter into agreement with owner of unimproved land between 5,000 square feet and five acres within zone pursuant to which owner agrees to restrict use of land to small-scale urban agricultural production for five consecutive years in exchange for special assessment of land. Provides that "agricultural production" does not mean growing, harvesting or processing marijuana. Allows subsequent five-year agreements. Provides transfer of title to unimproved land does not affect special assessment if requirements for special assessment are met under new ownership. Requires filing of application with county assessor. Provides for disqualification from special assessment and clawback of tax benefits if certain gross income requirements are not met or land is no longer used for urban agricultural production. Provides that designation of urban agriculture incentive zone has no effect on buildable land inventories or urban growth boundary of county or city that designates zone. For purpose of inventory of supply of buildable lands within urban growth boundary and determination of housing capacity, requires local government to consider extent to which designation of urban agriculture incentive zones will affect future development.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to urban agriculture; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Finance and Revenue by prior reference (Printed B-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. and be referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Finance and Revenue. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-04-29 | House | Third reading. Carried by Clem. Passed.Ayes, 50; Nays, 10--Bentz, Esquivel, Hack, Krieger, McLane, Nearman, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Wilson. |
2015-04-28 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 29, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-04-27 | House | Second reading. |
2015-04-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-04-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Rural Communities, Land Use and Water. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |