OR HB2721 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows dependent care income tax credit to be claimed for expenses to allow taxpayer or spouse to attend school as enrolled degree-seeking student. Allows dependent care income tax credit to be claimed for expenses to allow taxpayer or spouse to attend school as enrolled degree-seeking student. Limits expenses to combination of earned income taxable by Oregon and imputed income, using lesser amount attributable to either spouse on joint return. Provides for calculation based upon imputed income to allow degree-seeking enrolled student to claim credit. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2020, and before January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to use by enrolled degree-seeking student of tax credit for dependent care expenses; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Zika [R] | Rep. Gary Leif [R] | Rep. Bobby Levy [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Tax Expenditures (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-06-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-19 | House | Referred to Tax Expenditures by order of Speaker. |
2021-05-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Tax Expenditures. |
2021-05-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-08 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2021-04-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2021-04-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Human Services with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |