OR HB2697 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-9)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 147, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires education provider to prohibit display of any symbols of hate on school property or in education program. Requires education provider to prohibit use or] display of any symbols of hate on school property or in education program. Prescribes requirements that education provider must have in policy related to bias incidents and displays of symbols of hate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to school inclusivity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-25HouseChapter 147, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
2021-06-03HouseGovernor signed.
2021-05-27SenatePresident signed.
2021-05-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-05-20SenateThird reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 5--Anderson, Findley, Hansell, President Courtney, Thatcher.
2021-05-19SenateSecond reading.
2021-05-19SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2021-05-10SenateWork Session held.
2021-05-03SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-15SenateReferred to Education.
2021-04-12SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-04-10HouseThird reading. Carried by Smith DB, Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 47; Excused, 13--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Bynum, Clem, Hayden, Levy, Nearman, Pham, Reynolds, Wallan, Wilde, Williams, Zika.
2021-04-09HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-08HouseCarried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-06HouseCarried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-05HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar.
2021-03-31HouseCarried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-03-30HouseSecond reading.
2021-03-25HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-03-23HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-02HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Education.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2697
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2697/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2697/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2697/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2697/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31522
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=514739
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32245
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=524019

Bill Comments

feedback