OR HB2694 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds lesbian, gay, bisexual and transgender to definition of "minority individual" for purposes of providing public contracting opportunities to minority-owned businesses in this state. Adds lesbian, gay, bisexual and transgender to definition of "minority individual" for purposes of providing public contracting opportunities to minority-owned businesses in this state. Permits Oregon Business Development Department by rule to adopt standards from private organization for purpose of certifying businesses. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the inclusion of LGBT-owned businesses in business equity programs; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Witt [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] |
Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] | Rep. Karin Power [D] | Rep. Lisa Reynolds [D] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2694 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2694/Introduced |