OR HB2690 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires school district to pay classified school employee not less than 10 percent more than minimum wage that applies to all employees who work in this state . Requires school district to pay classified school employee not less than 10 percent more than minimum wage that applies to all employees who work in this state and not less than 15 percent more than minimum wage if classified school employee provides support to students with individualized education program or who are enrolled in special education]. Requires school district to pay certified educator salary of not less than $60,000] $50,000 per year or, if certified educator provides education to students with individualized education program or who are enrolled in special education, not less than $63,000 per year]. Requires school district to index wage and salary amounts to inflation.
Title
Relating to school district employee wages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-04 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2023-04-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-03-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-02-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-13 | House | Referred to Education. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |