OR HB2687 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 657, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 657, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Office of Emergency Management and Oregon Homeland Security Council to develop and administer grant program to distribute emergency preparedness equipment to local governments and other recipients. Establishes Resiliency Grant Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to Office of Emergency Management. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to emergency preparedness; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Paul Holvey [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Chapter 657, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2017. |
2017-08-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Linthicum. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-07-05 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-07-05 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-07-01 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-07-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-07-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-29 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2017-06-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-06-27 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2017-02-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-02-14 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |