OR HB2678 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Oregon Health Authority to adopt partially aligned preferred drug list for coordinated care organizations. Subject to exceptions, allows authority to require prior authorization for prescription drugs that are not listed on Practitioner-Managed Prescription Drug Plan and that are reimbursed on fee-for-service basis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prescription drugs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-25 - House - House Motion to Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-06-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2019-06-25HouseMotion to refer to Rules carried. Referred.
2019-06-25HouseVote reconsideration carried. Ayes, 37; Nays, 21--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 2--Boles, Clem.
2019-06-24HouseNosse served notice of possible reconsideration.
2019-06-24HouseThird reading. Carried by Nosse. Failed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 30--Barker, Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Bynum, Drazan, Evans, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McKeown, McLane, Meek, Nearman, Noble, Nosse, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilde, Wilson, Witt, Zika; Excused, 1--Clem.
2019-06-20HouseSecond reading.
2019-06-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2019-06-14HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-10HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2019-06-10HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-05-28HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2019-04-16HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2019-04-16HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2019-04-09HouseWork Session held.
2019-02-21HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-15HouseReferred to Health Care.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2678
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2678/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2678/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2678/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2678/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2678/B-Engrossed
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29000
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/30000
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=477005
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=477212

Bill Comments

feedback