OR HB2676 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Liquor Control Commission to register medical marijuana production sites, processing sites, wholesale sites and individuals who perform work that requires handling marijuana. Provides for testing of marijuana through existing laboratory accreditation program. Transfers regulation of medical marijuana dispensaries from Oregon Health Authority to commission. Amends other provisions of Oregon Medical Marijuana Act. Becomes operative January 1, 2016, and January 1, 2017. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to marijuana; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Implementing Measure 91. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB2676 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2676/Introduced |