OR HB2673 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires individual and group health insurance policies to reimburse services provided by naturopathic physicians within scope of their practice if services are reimbursed when provided by licensed physicians. Requires individual and group health insurance policies to reimburse services provided by naturopathic physicians within scope of their practice if services are reimbursed when provided by licensed physicians. Requires reimbursement paid to naturopathic physician in independent practice to be in same amount as reimbursement paid to physician. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to naturopathic physicians; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2673 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2673/Introduced |