OR HB2664 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Environmental Quality to study the impacts of sediment on fish habitat in the Rogue River and provide results of study in report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022. Directs Department of Environmental Quality to study the impacts of sediment on fish habitat in the Rogue River and provide results of study in report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the impacts of sediment on fish habitat in the Rogue River; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. David Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2664 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2664/Introduced |