OR HB2636 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 739, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 739, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes STEM Investment Council.
Title
Relating to advancement of STEM educational goals; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Harker [D] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Steiner Hayward [D] | Rep. John Davis [R] |
Rep. Jessica Pederson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-14 | House | Chapter 739, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2013. |
2013-08-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-07-01 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Harker. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Bailey, Weidner. |
2013-07-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed. |
2013-06-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-27 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-26 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2013-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third Reading. Motion to rerefer to Ways and Means carried. Rereferred. |
2013-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-06-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-18 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-13 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-03-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-03-11 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-02-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |