OR HB2635 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands membership of Justice Reinvestment Program Grant Review Committee. Specifies requirements for grant applications. Modifies manner in which grant applications are reviewed and grant funds distributed. Modifies criteria to be taken into account when appointing members of Oregon Criminal Justice Commission. Directs commission to assess extent to which each county is reducing racial and ethnic disparities in correctional population. Directs chairperson of commission to create advisory committee for Task Force on Public Safety. Directs advisory committee to report to task force no later than May 1, 2020, with recommendations to increase equity in allocation of public safety funds. Expands membership and duties of Task Force of Public Safety. Directs task force to report to Legislative Assembly on further findings, including response to report from advisory committee, no later than September 15, 2021.
Title
Relating to public safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2635 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2635/Introduced |