OR HB2620 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 738, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 738, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Governor to develop plan to align state economic and community development programs with regional and community based development programs.
Title
Relating to reorganization of state agencies; and appropriating money.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Clem [D] | Rep. Vic Gilliam [R] | Sen. Chris Edwards [D] | Rep. Kevin Cameron [R] |
Rep. Christopher Garrett [D] | Rep. Val Hoyle [D] | Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-14 | House | Chapter 738, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014. |
2013-08-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-07-01 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Clem. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 4--Davis, Hicks, Sprenger, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Bailey, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2013-07-01 | House | Second reading. |
2013-07-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-06-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-24 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-06-13 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-02-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |