OR HB2600 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - President signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires long term care facilities, conversion facilities and residential care facilities providing care to six or more residents to adopt specified protocols and procedures regarding preventing and reporting disease outbreaks. Requires facilities to have designated individual with specialized training to be responsible for carrying out infection prevention and control protocols. Requires Department of Human Services, in coordination with Oregon Health Authority, to communicate regularly with facility administrators regarding best practices and protocols and to notify facilities of elevated risk of disease outbreak in facility's community. Requires administrators and certain employees of facilities and adult foster homes to be trained in preventing and containing disease outbreaks and reporting disease outbreaks. Requires long term care facilities, conversion facilities and residential care facilities providing care to six or more residents to have inspection by department of kitchen and other areas where food is prepared to ensure compliance with health and sanitation laws. Requires Long Term Care Ombudsman to notify licensing agency about any disease outbreak reported to ombudsman by residents or identified by ombudsman and to train designees on how to identify and report disease outbreaks. Applies to licenses issued or renewed on or after January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to disease outbreaks in congregate care facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03SenatePresident signed.
2019-07-02HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-06-29SenateVote explanation filed by Wagner.
2019-06-29SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Wagner. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist.
2019-06-29SenateSecond reading.
2019-06-29SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2019-06-29SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-06-29SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-06-24HouseThird reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Clem.
2019-06-20HouseSecond reading.
2019-06-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2019-06-14HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-10HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2019-06-10HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-06-05HouseWork Session cancelled.
2019-06-03HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2019-04-16HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-04-16HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-04-09HouseWork Session held.
2019-01-31HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2600
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2600/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2600/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2600/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2600/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2600/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2600/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28986
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29999
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=477004
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=478004

Bill Comments

feedback