OR HB2600 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 658, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 658, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to adults with developmental disabilities.
Title
Relating to adults with developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-02 | Chapter 658, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012. | |
2011-08-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-27 | President signed. | |
2011-06-24 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-20 | Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist. | |
2011-06-17 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-17 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2011-06-15 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-06-14 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-06-14 | Third reading. Carried by Kotek. Passed. Ayes, 60. | |
2011-06-13 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-10 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-06-08 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-01 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-06-01 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-19 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-05-03 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2011-04-14 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2011-04-11 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-04 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-28 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Human Services with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2011-01-11 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |