OR HB2598 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 162, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 162, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits creation of certain noncharitable business purpose trusts. Permits creation of certain noncharitable business purpose trust] trusts. Provides exemption from statutory rule against perpetuities for certain noncharitable business purpose trust] trusts if terms of trust expressly] clearly elect exemption.
Title
Relating to noncharitable trusts with business purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 162, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-17 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Carried over to 05-16 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Fahey. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 5--Leif, Nearman, Reschke, Smith DB, Wallan; Excused, 3--Barreto, Evans, Marsh. |
2019-04-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 18, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-16 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary by order of Speaker. |
2019-02-15 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Judiciary. |
2019-02-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |