OR HB2594 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 720, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 720, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires insurer of liable party to pay actual costs of emergency response by private emergency responders.
Title
Relating to emergency response by private entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill. Refer to Rules (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill. Refer to Rules (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Chapter 720, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016. |
2015-07-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 24; nays, 5--Boquist, Ferrioli, Kruse, Thatcher, Thomsen; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. referred to Rules by order of the President. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-04-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Buckley. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Buehler, Hayden; Excused, 2--Reardon, Stark. |
2015-04-22 | House | Second reading. |
2015-04-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-04-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |