OR HB2585 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes requirements upon mental health treatment professionals and programs to ensure culturally and linguistically affirmative mental health services for individuals who are deaf, deaf-blind or hard of hearing. Imposes requirements upon mental health treatment professionals and programs to ensure culturally and linguistically affirmative mental health services for individuals who are deaf, deaf-blind or hard of hearing. Prohibits denial of access to culturally and linguistically affirmative mental health services based on residual hearing ability or previous experience with alternative mode of communication. Requires Oregon Health Authority to appoint advisory committee to advise authority on development and implementation of statewide access by individuals who are deaf, deaf-blind or hard of hearing to culturally and linguistically affirmative mental health services and programs. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to mental health services provided to individuals with impaired abilities to hear sounds; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Behavioral Health (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Behavioral Health (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-08 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-03-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health by order of Speaker. |
2021-01-29 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Behavioral Health. |
2021-01-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |