OR HB2583 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 24, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 24, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits establishment or enforcement of occupancy limits based on familial relationships on residential dwelling units by public bodies. Prohibits establishment or enforcement of occupancy limits based on familial relationships on residential dwelling units by public bodies.
Title
Relating to maximum occupancy of residential dwelling units.
Sponsors
Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] | Sen. Wlnsvey Campos [D] | Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] | Rep. Pam Marsh [D] |
Rep. Lily Morgan [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 24, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-05-12 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 1--Boquist; Excused, 2--Heard, Johnson. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Fahey. Passed. Ayes, 45; Nays, 1--Reschke; Excused, 14--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Bynum, Clem, Grayber, Hayden, Levy, Nearman, Owens, Pham, Reynolds, Wallan, Williams, Zika. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |