OR HB2578 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disallows, for purposes of personal income taxation, mortgage interest deduction for residence other than taxpayer's principal residence, unless taxpayer sells residence or actively markets residence for sale. Disallows, for purposes of personal income taxation, mortgage interest deduction for residence other than taxpayer's principal residence, unless taxpayer sells residence or actively markets residence for sale. Phases out allowable deduction for interest for principal residence based upon income. Disallows deduction for principal residence above threshold income amount. Establishes Oregon Housing Opportunity Account. Transfers amount equal to estimated increase in revenue attributable to restrictions on deduction of mortgage interest to account. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax treatment of mortgage interest; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Khanh Pham [D] | Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Sen. Wlnsvey Campos [D] |
Rep. Andrea Valderrama [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Golden [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Housing with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2578 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2578/Introduced |