OR HB2561 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Public Defense Services Commission to adopt policies providing for compensation of appointed counsel at rate commensurate with compensation of equivalent position within office of district attorney. Prohibits public defense services executive director from negotiating public defense services contract that allows for compensation at rate less than that of equivalent position within office of district attorney. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to public defense compensation; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2017-03-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-03-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |