OR HB2546 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 655, (2011 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 655, (2011 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to exemption from property taxation; and prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to exemption from property taxation; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-02 | Chapter 655, (2011 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2011. | |
2011-08-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-27 | President signed. | |
2011-06-24 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-21 | Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Bates, Boquist. | |
2011-06-20 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-20 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2011-06-17 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-25 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-05-10 | Referred to Finance and Revenue. | |
2011-05-09 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-05-05 | Third reading. Carried by Barnhart. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 3--Esquivel, Garrard, Schaufler; Excused, 1--Kennemer; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Bailey, Garrett, Wingard. | |
2011-05-04 | Rules suspended. Second reading. | |
2011-05-03 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-04-29 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-20 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Revenue. | |
2011-01-11 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |