OR HB2511 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter 387, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 20, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter 387, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 20, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes residential tenant to install on premises and use electric vehicle charging station for personal, noncommercial use. Declares charging station to be personal property of tenant unless different result is negotiated between parties. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to electric vehicle charging stations; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | House | Chapter 387, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 20, 2017. |
2017-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 45; Nays, 13--Barreto, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Sprenger, Wilson; Excused, 1--Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Girod declared potential conflict of interest. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 21; nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Kruse, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen, Winters. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barnhart. Passed.Ayes, 45; Nays, 13--Barreto, Esquivel, Hayden, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Sprenger, Stark, Wilson; Excused, 2--Boone, Power. |
2017-03-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 3, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-03-29 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 30, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-03-28 | House | Second reading. |
2017-03-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-03-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |