OR HB2504 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Chapter 46, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Chapter 46, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increases maximum expenditure appropriation for tax supervising and conservation commissions and increases annual percentage increase in maximum expenditure appropriation. Authorizes commissions to charge for services provided by commissions to nonmember municipal corporations and to apply for and receive grants. Provides that funds earned from charges and grants shall supplement, not supplant, commission's expenditure appropriation. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax supervising and conservation commissions; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Chapter 46, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-05-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Hansell, Linthicum, Winters. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Carried over to 04-22 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Carried over to 04-18 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Carried over to 04-17 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed. Ayes, 41; Nays, 13--Barreto, Bonham, Drazan, Hayden, Leif, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Speaker Kotek, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 6--Boles, Findley, Marsh, McLane, Smith DB, Sprenger. |
2019-03-14 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 18, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-03-13 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |