OR HB2498 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 14, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 14, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that registered owner may request that registration card issued for vehicle include that owner, or person operating vehicle, may be deaf or hard of hearing. Provides that registered owner may request that registration card issued for vehicle include that owner, or person operating vehicle, may be deaf or hard of hearing. Prohibits Department of Transportation from adding restriction on driver license or driver permit if reason for restriction is because person is deaf or hard of hearing.] Provides that person may include on driver license or identification card fact that person is deaf or hard of hearing.
Title
Relating to vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 14, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-05-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Heard, Patterson, Thatcher. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 46; Excused, 14--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Bynum, Clem, Grayber, Hayden, Levy, Nearman, Owens, Pham, Reynolds, Wallan, Williams, Zika. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |