OR HB2490 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Chapter 33, (2015 Laws): Effective date April 16, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Chapter 33, (2015 Laws): Effective date April 16, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes to August 31 end date for annual indexing of maximum aggregate amount that local government official or tribal government official may place in investment pool in custody of State Treasurer. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the indexing of investment pool limitations; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Committee Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Committee Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-17 | House | Chapter 33, (2015 Laws): Effective date April 16, 2015. |
2015-04-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Thomsen. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Carried over to 04-08 by unanimous consent. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-03-02 | House | Read third time under Consent Calendar. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Esquivel, Gorsek. |
2015-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 2, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-02-25 | House | Second reading. |
2015-02-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be placed on Consent Calendar. |
2015-02-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |