OR HB2487 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Department of Administrative Services to study and make recommendations regarding use of blockchain technology by state agencies to administer public services. Requires department to submit report on findings by January 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to blockchain technology.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Holvey [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |