OR HB2469 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends sunset for tax credit for pension income.
Title
Relating to tax credits for pension income.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-09 | House | Referred to Tax Credits by prior reference. |
2013-04-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Tax Credits by prior reference. |
2013-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Business and Labor with subsequent referral to Tax Credits. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |