OR HB2466 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extends low income rental housing property tax exemption to housing units owned by limited equity cooperative corporations. Extends low income rental housing property tax exemption to housing units owned by limited equity cooperative corporations. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to limited equity cooperative low income housing; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. |
2023-02-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. |
2023-02-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-01-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Housing and Homelessness with subsequent referral to Tax Expenditures. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |