OR HB2460 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 488, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 488, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that transferee of tax-deferred homestead is liable for amounts of outstanding deferred property taxes due on homestead if transferee is using homestead more than 90 days following taxpayer's death and is potential recipient of homestead under intestate succession or by devise or received homestead from estate of deceased taxpayer or right to homestead by gift or assignment from insolvent taxpayer. Provides that transferee of tax-deferred homestead is not] liable for amounts of outstanding deferred property taxes due on homestead if transferee receives no interest in real or personal property from estate] is using homestead more than 90 days following taxpayer's death and is potential recipient of homestead under intestate succession or by devise or received homestead from estate of deceased taxpayer or right to homestead by gift or assignment from insolvent taxpayer. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the liability of transferees for deferred homestead property taxes; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Chapter 488, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-06-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-19 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed. Ayes, 29. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-05-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Hernandez. |
2019-05-14 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-05-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |