OR HB2459 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 140, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 140, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits person or agent of person that holds lien that encumbers real property to request statement from person that holds another lien that also encumbers same real property of amount that is necessary to pay off other lien. Provides procedure for certain persons that hold interest in real property to request and obtain lien information statement that shows amounts necessary to satisfy encumbrance against real property from other person that holds encumbrance.] Requires encumbrance holder to respond to request for lien information statement within 30 days after receiving request. Permits encumbrance holder to require evidence that person requesting lien information statement is authorized recipient. Specifies model form for request and information that lien information statement must include.] Provides remedies for encumbrance holder's failure to provide lien information statement or to postpone action or proceeding to enforce encumbrance to allow reasonable time for authorized recipient to satisfy encumbrance.] Permits authorized recipient to treat lien information statement as payoff statement for purposes of satisfying obligation that encumbrance secures.] Permits person that receives request to provide statement without permission of obligor on other lien unless federal or state law requires obligor's consent.
Title
Relating to lien information statements for real property that is subject to an encumbrance.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Chapter 140, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Carried over to 05-15 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Findley, Rayfield. |
2019-04-16 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |