OR HB2459 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Applies statutory bar to foreclosure of outstanding property taxes to outstanding taxes owed by individual who was, or whose homestead was determined to be, ineligible for homestead property tax deferral program as result of recent changes in law and whose homestead was reactivated for deferral during certain period.
Title
Relating to homestead property taxes; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-02-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |