OR HB2458 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Freezes assessed value of homestead of certain seniors and disabled individuals at assessed value on date claim filed.
Title
Relating to the assessed value of property; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |