OR HB2457 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 456, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 456, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Updates connection date to federal Internal Revenue Code and other provisions of federal tax law. Updates connection date to federal Internal Revenue Code and other provisions of federal tax law. Expands types of expenses, in conformity with federal law, for which use of withdrawal from higher education savings network account is qualified withdrawal for purpose of tax-advantaged treatment. Conforms age limits, applicable to retirement and to commencing payment of benefits, to federal law, for purposes of Public Employees Retirement System. Applies to transactions or activities occurring on or after January 1, 2021, in tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2021. Ties to provisions of federal law as amended and in effect on April 1, 2021. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to connection to federal tax law; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 456, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-07-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Evans, Morgan, Prusak. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Kennemer, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-05-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Evans, Helm, Sanchez. |
2021-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 19, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-17 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-05-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |