OR HB2450 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts express sunset for tax credit for establishment of employee training programs in rural counties. Enacts express sunset for tax credit for establishment of employee training programs in rural counties.
Title
Relating to a tax credit for employee training programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-05-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-30 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2021-03-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2021-03-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Economic Recovery and Prosperity with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |